VA HB2556 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Health Professions and health regulatory boards; information obtained in an investigation or disciplinary proceeding; authorized disclosures. Provides that provisions protecting the confidentiality of information obtained during an investigation or disciplinary hearing do not prohibit the disclosure of information about a suspected violation of state or federal law or regulation to state law enforcement. Under current law, such disclosure is authorized only to agencies within the Health and Human Resources Secretariat or to federal law-enforcement agencies. The bill also provides that investigative staff of agencies to which disclosure is authorized are not prohibited from interviewing fact witnesses, disclosing to fact witnesses the identity of the subject of the complaint or report, or reviewing with fact witnesses any portion of records or other supporting documentation necessary to refresh the fact witnesses' recollection.
Title
Health Professions, Dept. of, & health regulatory boards; information obtained in an investigation.
Sponsors
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 663 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 663 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2556ER) |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101010D |