VA HB2552 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Unmanned aircraft systems; delayed notice of search warrant when deployed. Provides that within 10 days after an unmanned aircraft system is used during the execution of a search warrant, a copy of the executed search warrant shall be served on the person who was the subject of the search warrant and the person whose property was the subject of the search warrant. The bill provides that upon request, and for good cause shown, the circuit court may grant one or more extensions for such service for a period not to exceed 30 days each.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unmanned aircraft systems; search warrants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 16-N) (Y: 83 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 3-N) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11SenatePassed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N)
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute printed to LIS only 19106821D-S1
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 16-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (83-Y 16-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2552H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105089D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105089D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 3-N)
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103317D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19260.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback