VA HB2551 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0161)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Commercial driver's licenses; military service members. Requires the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles to waive certain knowledge and skills tests required for obtaining a commercial learner's permit or commercial driver's license or a commercial driver's license endorsement for certain current or former military service members, as authorized by federal law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial driver's licenses; military service members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0161)
2019-02-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 161 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2551ER)
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-28HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseReported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103408D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462341.14:01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2551
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2551+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2551ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0161+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1903V0013+HB2551
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H19V0033+HB2551
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1991+HB2551
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2037+HB2551
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S11V0131+HB2551
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB2551+HB2551
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB2551+HB2551

Bill Comments

feedback