VA HB2543 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health benefit plans; balance billing for ancillary services. Prohibits an out-of-network provider from balance billing a covered person for the costs of an ancillary service when an in-network provider referred the covered person to the out-of-network provider unless (i) the referring in-network provider provided the covered person with a notice of liability for the balance; (ii) the out-of-network provider, prior to providing an ancillary service to the covered person, provided a good faith estimate of the out-of-network provider's charges upon request; (iii) the out-of-network provider provided the covered person with a notice of liability for the balance; and (iv) the covered person acknowledged, by signing the out-of-network provider's notice of liability for the balance, that he is aware that using the out-of-network provider may result in his being balance billed. The prohibition on balance billing applies to amounts in excess of the allowed amount, which is the amount that a carrier is obligated to pay, pursuant to the terms of the covered person's health benefit plan, to a covered person for ancillary services provided by an out-of-network provider, net any copayment, deductible, or other cost-sharing amount.
Title
Health benefit plans; balance billing for ancillary services.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103728D |