VA HB254 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Required 66 affirmative votes to override the Governor's Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on February 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Required 66 affirmative votes to override the Governor's Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
House of Delegates districts; technical adjustment. Changes district assignments of certain census blocks between Districts 28 and 88 in the City of Fredericksburg in order to place all of current Precinct 401, presently divided between the two districts, in District 28. Both districts will continue to have a deviation of less than one percent from the ideal district population.
Title
House of Delegates districts; technical adjustment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (64-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 33-N) (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 33-N) (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | Required 66 affirmative votes to override the Governor's Veto |
2016-02-29 | House | VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (64-Y 34-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | House sustained Governor's veto (64-Y 34-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-24 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2016-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Wednesday, February 24, 2016 | |
2016-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/16 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB254ER) |
2016-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (7-Y 6-N) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 33-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (63-Y 33-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-29 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 7-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments |
2015-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101784D |