VA HB2530 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Medicaid; cost-sharing. Requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services to require individuals receiving medical assistance pursuant to the state plan for medical assistance whose household income is greater than 100 percent of the federal poverty level for a household the size of the individual's household to participate in cost-sharing to the greatest extent allowed under federal law and to require individuals receiving medical assistance pursuant to the state plan for medical assistance whose household income is equal to or less than 100 percent of the federal poverty level for a household the size of the individual's household to participate in cost-sharing for nonemergency services delivered in a hospital emergency department to the greatest extent allowed by federal law. The bill also requires hospitals with emergency departments to develop a protocol for patients who receive medical assistance pursuant to the state plan for medical assistance to whom a service other than an emergency service will be provided to (i) inform the patient as to the amount of the cost-sharing obligation for such nonemergency services for which the patient may be responsible; (ii) provide the patient with information, including name and location, about available nonemergency health care providers; and (iii) provide a referral to such nonemergency health care provider to facilitate treatment of the patient by the nonemergency health care provider.
Title
Medicaid; cost-sharing.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101351D |