VA HB2529 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 17 (effective 2/15/19)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Income tax; conformity. Advances conformity of the Commonwealth's tax code with the federal tax code to December 31, 2018, effective starting in taxable year 2018. Starting in taxable year 2019, the bill deconforms from the provisions of the federal Tax Cuts and Jobs Act (TCJA) that limit the deduction for state and local taxes and that suspend the overall limit on itemized deductions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax, state; conformity of taxation system with the IRC.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (51-Y 43-N) (Y: 51 N: 43 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 17 (effective 2/15/19)
2019-02-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 20, 2019
2019-02-13HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 13, 2019
2019-02-13SenateSigned by President
2019-02-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-12HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2529ER)
2019-02-12HouseEnrolled
2019-02-12HouseVOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (95-Y 4-N)
2019-02-12HouseEmergency clause added
2019-02-12HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106700D-S2 (95-Y 4-N)
2019-02-12HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate with substitute (35-Y 5-N)
2019-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB2529S2
2019-02-11SenateSubstitute by Senator Newman agreed to 19106700D-S2
2019-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-11SenateFloor substitute printed 19106700D-S2 (Newman)
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute rejected 19106602D-S1
2019-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-11SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateRead second time
2019-02-08SenateIncorporates HB2355 (Jones, S.C.)
2019-02-08SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106602D-S1
2019-02-08SenateReported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 48-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (51-Y 48-N)
2019-02-05HousePending question ordered
2019-02-05HouseMotion to pass by temporarily until completion of HB2355 agreed to
2019-02-04HousePassed by for the day
2019-02-04HouseMotion to pass by until end of calendar agreed to
2019-02-04HousePassed by temporarily
2019-02-01HouseVOTE: ENGROSSMENT (51-Y 43-N)
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute (51-Y 43-N) HB2529H1
2019-02-01HousePending question ordered
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19104698D-H1
2019-02-01HousePassed by temporarily
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-30HouseRead first time
2019-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 19104698D-H1
2019-01-28HouseReported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-23HouseReferred from Rules by voice vote
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104278D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581301(n/a)See Bill Text
581322.03(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2529
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2529+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2529H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2529S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2529S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2529ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H10V0051+HB2529
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2129+HB2529
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2424+HB2529
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0303+HB2529
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0506HB2529+HB2529
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2675+HB2529

Bill Comments

feedback