VA HB252 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB252

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Causing or encouraging acts rendering children sexually abused; penalty. Provides that any person 18 years of age or older who (i) (a) has physical custody of a minor, (b) allows a minor to reside at his residence, (c) is in a position of trust or authority over a minor, or (d) is the temporary caretaker of a minor; (ii) is more than three years older than such minor; and (iii) willfully contributes to, encourages, or causes any act, omission, or condition that results in any sexual act upon the minor in violation of the law is guilty of a Class 4 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Causing or encouraging acts rendering children sexually abused; penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2020-02-07HouseContinued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2020-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-02-04HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2019-12-30HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-12-30HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102314D

Same As/Similar To

HB252 (Carry Over) 2020-02-07 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182371.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback