VA HB2513 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; occupation disease presumptions; PTSD. Establishes a presumption that if certain firefighters, law-enforcement officers, hazardous materials officers, animal protection police officers, or 9-1-1 emergency call takers, dispatchers, or similarly situated employees (i) receive a diagnosis of post-traumatic stress disorder (PTSD) from a licensed physician, licensed clinical psychologist, licensed professional counselor, or licensed clinical social worker; (ii) suffer death or any impairment resulting in total or partial disability from work caused by the PTSD; and (iii) receive a statement from such a provider that the PTSD was caused by a single critical event or multiple exposures to critical events that occurred in the course of the employment, then the PTSD is an occupational disease, suffered in the line of duty, that is covered by the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act unless such presumption is overcome by a preponderance of competent evidence to the contrary. The measure provides that a "critical event" includes an event that results in serious injury or death to an individual; deals with a minor who has been injured, killed, abused, exploited, or a victim of a crime; deals with mass casualties; results in injury to or the death of a coworker; involves an immediate threat to the life of the claimant or another individual; or involves the abuse, cruelty, injury, exploitation, or death of an animal.
Title
Workers' compensation; occupation disease presumptions, PTSD.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 4-N) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102118D |