VA HB2511 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
HOT lanes on Interstate 66; operating hours. Sets the operating hours for HOT lanes on Interstate 66 inside the Beltway from 6:30 a.m. to 9:00 a.m. for eastbound lanes and from 4:00 p.m. to 6:30 p.m. for westbound lanes.
Title
HOT lanes on Interstate 66; operating hours.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment (16-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101594D |