VA HB2510 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Maximum number of judges in each judicial district. Increases from 11 to 12 the maximum number of authorized general district court judgeships in the nineteenth judicial district. This bill is a recommendation of the Committee on District Courts.
Title
Judges; maximum number in nineteenth judicial district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101667D |