VA HB251 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB251

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prostitution-related crimes; minors; penalties. Makes it a Class 6 felony for an adult to visit a bawdy place with a minor when he knows that the bawdy place is used or to be used for lewdness, assignation, or prostitution. The bill also adds felony violations of such offense to (i) the list of offenses for which registration in the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry is required, (ii) the definition of violent felony for the purposes of the sentencing guidelines, (iii) the list of predicate criminal acts that constitutes the definition of street gangs, (iv) the list of offenses that may constitute racketeering under the Virginia Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organization Act, and (v) the offenses that may be investigated by a multi-jurisdiction grand jury. The bill also makes applicable to all persons, regardless of the gender of the victim, the crimes of (a) assisting or aiding in the abduction of or threatening to abduct a female under 16 years of age for the purpose of concubinage or prostitution, which the bill also changes to include any person under 18 years of age, and (b) placing or leaving one's wife in a bawdy place. Prostitution-related crimes; minors; penalties. Makes it a Class 6 felony for an adult to visit a bawdy place with a minor when he knows that the bawdy place is used or to be used for lewdness, assignation, or prostitution. The bill also adds felony violations of such offense to (i) the list of offenses for which registration in the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry is required, (ii) the definition of violent felony for the purposes of the sentencing guidelines, (iii) the list of predicate criminal acts that constitutes the definition of street gangs, (iv) the list of offenses that may constitute racketeering under the Virginia Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organization Act, and (v) the offenses that may be investigated by a multi-jurisdiction grand jury. The bill also makes applicable to all persons, regardless of the gender of the victim, the crimes of (a) assisting or aiding in the abduction of or threatening to abduct a female under 16 years of age for the purpose of concubinage or prostitution, which the bill also changes to include any person under 18 years of age, and (b) placing or leaving one's wife in a bawdy place.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prostitution-related crimes; minors, increases penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 1-N) (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04SenateLeft in Judiciary
2020-02-19SenateContinued to 2021 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (96-Y 1-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (96-Y 1-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB251H1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107946D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107946D-H1
2020-02-07HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 1-N)
2020-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2019-12-30HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-12-30HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102229D

Same As/Similar To

HB251 (Carry Over) 2020-02-19 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171805(n/a)See Bill Text
182347(n/a)See Bill Text
182368(n/a)See Bill Text
18246.1(n/a)See Bill Text
18249(n/a)See Bill Text
182513(n/a)See Bill Text
192215.1(n/a)See Bill Text
91902(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB251
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB251+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB251H1+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB251F160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB251F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB251FH1160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB251FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0801C0145+HB0251
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H08C0225+HB0251
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HC0874+HB0251
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S03C0379+HB0251

Bill Comments

feedback