VA HB2504 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0515)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0515)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation District Commission of Hampton Roads. Provides for appointment by the Governor of one member of the commission from each of the District's constituent localities. The bill also provides for the appointment of ex officio members with voting privileges by the District's constituent localities.
Title
Transportation District Commission of Hampton Roads; appointments by Governor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0515) | |
2011-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 515 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-25 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2504ER) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2504H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105079D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105079D-H1 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N) | |
2011-01-26 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #1 | |
2011-01-21 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-01-21 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11104211D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Governor
Hampton Roads Area
Transportation
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Governor
Hampton Roads Area
Transportation