VA HB2496 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Human Rights Act; creation of cause of action for Virginia Human Rights Act; creation of cause of action for discrimination based on race, color, religion, national origin, sex, pregnancy, childbirth or related medical conditions, or age. Creates a cause of action against any employer employing more than five but fewer than 15 persons who engages in an unlawful discriminatory act against any employee on the basis of race, color, religion, national origin, sex, pregnancy, childbirth or related medical conditions, including lactation. The bill also creates a cause of action against any employer employing more than five but fewer than 20 persons who engages in an unlawful discriminatory act against an employee on the basis of age if the employee is 40 years of age or older. Under current law, an employee who has been discriminated against on the basis of race, color, religion, national origin, sex, pregnancy, childbirth or related medical conditions, including lactation, or age may only file an action against his employer if the employee is discharged by the employer on the basis of race, color, religion, national origin, sex, pregnancy, childbirth or related medical conditions, including lactation, or age. The bill permits a court, in cases where the employee prevails, to award compensatory or punitive damages in an amount of up to $25,000 and attorney fees not to exceed 25 percent of the amount awarded. The bill provides that the provisions creating a cause of action against an employer who engages in unlawful discriminatory practices against an employee shall apply only to unlawful discriminatory practices that

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Human Rights Act; creation of cause of action for discrimination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 3-N) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 3-N)
2019-01-22HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104161D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223903(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback