VA HB2496 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-27 - House: Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-27 - House: Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Capital outlay plan. Sets forth a six-year capital outlay plan for projects to be funded entirely or partially from general fund-supported resources.
Title
Capital outlay plan; sets forth 6-year plan for project funded entirely from general fund resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-27 | House: Failed to pass in House | |
2011-02-27 | House: No further action taken | |
2011-02-24 | House: Delegates: Putney, Jones, Joannou | |
2011-02-24 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senators: Colgan, Hanger, Marsh | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2011-02-24 | House: House acceded to request | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Senate substitute rejected by House 11105286D-S1 (0-Y 98-N) | |
2011-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2496S1 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11105286D-S1 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11105286D-S1 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-04 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2496H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104772D-H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-02 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-31 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104772D-H1 | |
2011-01-31 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | House: Assigned App. sub: Capital Outlay | |
2011-01-21 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-21 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11102823D |