VA HB2486 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-20 - Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (7-Y 8-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-20 - Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (7-Y 8-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Soft drink companies and bottlers; transfer of business; remedies. Prohibits soft drink companies from unreasonably withholding or delaying consent to any transfer of a bottler's business or the transfer of the stock or other interest in the bottler's business when a proposed transferee bottler meets the soft drink company's material and reasonable qualification requirements. The bill also prohibits soft drink companies from withholding consent to, or in any manner retaining a right of prior approval of, the transfer of a bottler's business to a principal owner of the bottler or a family member. Cases or controversies arising under the requirements of the bill have jurisdiction in the circuit court of the city or county where the bottler has its principal place of business, and the court may grant equitable relief as necessary to remedy the effects of conduct prohibited under the bill. A contract or agreement between a soft drink company and a bottler that purports to waive the requirements of the bill shall be considered void and unenforceable to the extent of such waiver.
Title
Soft drink companies and bottlers; transfer of business, remedies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (7-Y 8-N) (Y: 7 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (76-Y 23-N) (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (76-Y 23-N) (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-20 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (7-Y 8-N) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (76-Y 23-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (76-Y 23-N) |
2023-02-03 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy (14-Y 6-N) |
2023-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2023-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23102796D |