VA HB2486 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0409)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0409)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Teacher licensure; reciprocity; alternate routes. Requires the Board of Education, in its regulations providing for licensure by reciprocity, to grant special consideration to individuals who have successfully completed a program offered by a provider that is accredited by the Council for the Accreditation of Educator Preparation. The bill also requires the Board of Education to develop guidelines that establish a process to permit a school board or any organization sponsored by a school board to petition the Board for approval of an alternate route to licensure that may be used to meet the requirements for a provisional or renewable license or any endorsement.
Title
Teacher licensure; provisional license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0409) | |
2019-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 409 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2486ER) |
2019-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 19106890D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2486S1 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106890D-S1 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Incorporates HB1643 (Hope) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106890D-S1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2486H1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105579D-H1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105579D-H1 |
2019-01-28 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101521D |