VA HB2477 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0602)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0602)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Health to take steps to begin eliminating site evaluation and design services for onsite sewage systems and private wells. Directs the Department of Health to take certain steps to begin eliminating site evaluation and design services for onsite sewage systems and private wells provided by the Department.
Title
Onsite sewage systems and private wells; VDH to take steps to eliminate site evaluation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 5-N) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 5-N) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0602) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 602 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2477ER) |
2017-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (92-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 17104320D-E |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2477E |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-24 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17104320D |
2017-01-24 | House | Unanimous consent to introduce |
Subjects
Sewage Disposal and Sewerage Systems
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Water and Sewer Systems
Wells
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Water and Sewer Systems
Wells