VA HB2472 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; spirits tastings by distiller licensee. Increases the single sample size for tastings of spirits to one ounce or two ounces when served as a mixed beverage.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; spirits tastings by distiller licensee.
Sponsors
Del. Matt Fariss [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in General Laws |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-27 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-20 | House | Introduced bill reprinted 17104562D |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17104562D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2472 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2472+hil |