VA HB2470 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Drug Control Act; Schedule II and Schedule V. Adds thiafentanil to Schedule II of the Drug Control Act and brivaracetam to Schedule V of the Drug Control Act.
Title
Drug Control Act; Schedule II and Schedule V.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 612 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2470ER) |
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2017-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17104071D |