VA HB2465 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Photo-monitoring systems; requirements for localities. The bill requires that engineering safety analyses and monthly evaluations conducted by a locality related to traffic light signal photo-monitoring systems, commonly known as red-light cameras, be posted on such locality's website, if available. The bill requires the reporting of certain traffic incident and financial data. The bill requires localities to establish a 15-day probationary period during which only advisory letters are issued for recorded traffic light signal violations when such a system is implemented or expanded. The bill has a delayed effective date for localities with existing traffic light signal photo-monitoring systems.
Title
Photo-monitoring systems; requirements for localities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Senate | Left in Local Government |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-31 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (89-Y 10-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104071D |