VA HB2461 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Secretary of Finance; COVID-19 penalty reimbursements; sunset. Requires all state agencies to report to the Secretary of Finance the total amount of fines, fees, and interest imposed on individuals, businesses, and nonprofit organizations, including any withdrawal, suspension, or cancellation of an individual's license or certification, resulting from violations of the Commonwealth's COVID-19 practices, guidelines, rules, or operating procedures and any state contracts that were not awarded as a result of noncompliance with the Commonwealth's COVID-19 guidelines. The bill also requires all state agencies to include in such report the fund into which such amounts were deposited. The bill directs the Secretary of Finance, in consultation with the Cabinet Secretaries with responsibility for the impacted agencies, to develop a procedure to provide reimbursement to such individuals, businesses, and nonprofit organizations up to the amount of fines, fees, or interest previously paid for such violations. The bill specifies that the procedure developed by the Secretary of Finance shall provide for the reimbursement to such individuals, businesses, and nonprofit organizations of such amounts from the fund into which the original amounts were deposited. The bill has a sunset date of July 1, 2025. Secretary of Finance; COVID-19 penalty reimbursements; sunset. Requires all state agencies to report to the Secretary of Finance the total amount of fines, fees, and interest imposed on individuals, businesses, and nonprofit organizations, including any withdrawal, suspension, or cancellation of an individual's license or certification, resulting from violations of the Commonwealth's COVID-19 practices, guidelines, rules, or operating procedures and any state contracts that were not awarded as a result of noncompliance with the Commonwealth's COVID-19 guidelines. The bill also requires all state agencies to include in such report the fund into which such amounts were deposited. The bill directs the Secretary of Finance, in consultation with the Cabinet Secretaries with responsibility for the impacted agencies, to develop a procedure to provide reimbursement to such individuals, businesses, and nonprofit organizations up to the amount of fines, fees, or interest previously paid for such violations. The bill specifies that the procedure developed by the Secretary of Finance shall provide for the reimbursement to such individuals, businesses, and nonprofit organizations of such amounts from the fund into which the original amounts were deposited. The bill has a sunset date of July 1, 2025.
Title
COVID-19; penalty reimbursements, sunset provision.
Sponsors
Sen. Tara Durant [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 6-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 47-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2461H1 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23106161D-H1 |
2023-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 23106161D-H1 |
2023-02-02 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2023-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2023-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23104547D |