VA HB2455 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regulation of charitable gaming and historical horse racing. Transfers regulatory control of charitable gaming and historical horse racing from the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services and the Virginia Racing Commission, respectively, to the Virginia Lottery, renamed in the bill as the Virginia Lottery and Gaming Department. The bill directs the Virginia Lottery Board, renamed as the Virginia Lottery and Gaming Oversight Board, to promulgate regulations necessary for the conduct of (i) historical horse racing, with the assistance of the Virginia Racing Commission, by December 1, 2023, and (ii) charitable gaming, with the assistance of the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, by July 1, 2024. All relevant regulations of the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services and the Virginia Racing Commission shall remain in full force and effect until the effective transfer of such regulations to the Virginia Lottery and Gaming Oversight Board.
Title
Charitable gaming and historical horse racing; regulation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in General Laws |
2023-01-30 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2023-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2023-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23103241D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 912.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.016 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 334.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 334.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.37 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 215.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2455 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2456 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 419 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 322.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3732.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4008 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4011 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4015.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4019.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4020.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4022 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4025 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4027 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4030 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4048 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4087 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4123 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 460 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 148.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 365 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 369 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 392 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 195.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 216.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 534 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |