VA HB2454 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Support person for minor victim; presence in courtroom. Requires a court to permit an adult chosen by a minor victim in a criminal case to be present in the courtroom during any proceedings in addition to or in lieu of the minor's parent or guardian. Under current law, a court has discretionary authority to permit such person to be present during any proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Support person for minor victim; presence in courtroom.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101315D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192265.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback