VA HB2453 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0176)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0176)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Bail and recognizances; magistrate's checklist; surety's basis for request for capias. Requires a magistrate who conducts a bail hearing for a person arrested on a warrant or capias for a jailable offense to describe, on a form provided by the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court, the information considered in conducting such hearing, including (i) the nature and circumstances of the offense, (ii) whether a firearm was used in the offense, (iii) the financial resources of the accused, (iv) the character and appearance of the accused, and (v) the criminal history of the accused. The bill requires such magistrate to transmit such completed form to the circuit court or district before which the warrant or capias is returnable. The bill also requires a surety on a bond in recognizance to state the basis for which a capias is being requested from the court on the surety's application for the capias. As introduced, the bill was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.
Title
Bail and recognizances; magistrate's checklist, surety's basis for request for capias.
Sponsors
Del. Les Adams [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0176) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 176 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2453ER) |
2019-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Printed as engrossed 19104059D-E |
2019-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2453E |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104059D |