VA HB2453 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0176)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Bail and recognizances; magistrate's checklist; surety's basis for request for capias. Requires a magistrate who conducts a bail hearing for a person arrested on a warrant or capias for a jailable offense to describe, on a form provided by the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court, the information considered in conducting such hearing, including (i) the nature and circumstances of the offense, (ii) whether a firearm was used in the offense, (iii) the financial resources of the accused, (iv) the character and appearance of the accused, and (v) the criminal history of the accused. The bill requires such magistrate to transmit such completed form to the circuit court or district before which the warrant or capias is returnable. The bill also requires a surety on a bond in recognizance to state the basis for which a capias is being requested from the court on the surety's application for the capias. As introduced, the bill was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bail and recognizances; magistrate's checklist, surety's basis for request for capias.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0176)
2019-02-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 176 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2453ER)
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HousePrinted as engrossed 19104059D-E
2019-01-24HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2453E
2019-01-24HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-24HouseRead second time
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104059D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192121(n/a)See Bill Text
192149(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2453
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2453+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2453E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2453ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0176+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0048+HB2453
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0022+HB2453
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1878+HB2453
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0210+HB2453
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB2453+HB2453
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB2453+HB2453

Bill Comments

feedback