VA HB2453 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0326)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0326)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Flashing amber lights; amateur radio operators. Permits vehicles used or operated by federally licensed amateur radio operators participating in emergency communications drills on behalf of federal, state, or local authorities or providing communications services to localities for public service events authorized by the Department of Transportation where the event is being conducted to be equipped with flashing, blinking, or alternating amber lights, provided that the lights are not lit while the vehicle is in motion.
Title
Amateur radio operators; use of flashing amber lights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0326) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 326 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2453ER) |
2017-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (11-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (91-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 17104164D-E |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2453E |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendments (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17104164D |