VA HB2451 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0087)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0087)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Firefighters; training; electric vehicle fires. Directs the Executive Director of the Department of Fire Programs to develop a training program on the risks of fires in electric vehicles and how to safely and effectively manage such fires to be completed by all firefighters, including volunteer firefighters, and requires the Executive Director to make such training program available by July 1, 2024. Effective July 1, 2024, all firefighters, including volunteer firefighters, are required to complete such training program. The bill provides that every person engaged in firefighting activities on July 1, 2024, has until December 1, 2025, to complete such training program. Firefighters; training; electric vehicle fires. Directs the Executive Director of the Department of Fire Programs to develop a training program on the risks of fires in electric vehicles and how to safely and effectively manage such fires to be completed by all firefighters, including volunteer firefighters, and requires the Executive Director to make such training program available by July 1, 2024. Effective July 1, 2024, all firefighters, including volunteer firefighters, are required to complete such training program. The bill provides that every person engaged in firefighting activities on July 1, 2024, has until December 1, 2025, to complete such training program.
Title
Firefighters; training program on risks of electric vehicle fires.
Sponsors
Del. Israel O'Quinn [R] | Del. Mike Cherry [R] | Del. Wendell Walker [R] | Del. Bill Wiley [R] |
Del. Wren Williams [R] | Del. Thomas Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0087) | |
2023-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 87 (effective - see bill) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2451ER) |
2023-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-01 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to |
2023-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-27 | House | Reported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2023-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23104387D |