VA HB2448 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Admission to bail; expiration and extension of recognizance; notice to bail bondsman and surety company. Limits any recognizance entered into by a bail bondsman to three years from the date such recognizance was executed, unless the court or the attorney for the Commonwealth for the jurisdiction from which the recognizance was taken provides written notice to the bail bondsman and any surety company that guarantees the bond in such recognizance that the recognizance is being extended for an additional period of time not to exceed three years.
Title
Admission to bail; expiration and extension of recognizance, notice to bail bondsman.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102822D |