VA HB2448 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Admission to bail; expiration and extension of recognizance; notice to bail bondsman and surety company. Limits any recognizance entered into by a bail bondsman to three years from the date such recognizance was executed, unless the court or the attorney for the Commonwealth for the jurisdiction from which the recognizance was taken provides written notice to the bail bondsman and any surety company that guarantees the bond in such recognizance that the recognizance is being extended for an additional period of time not to exceed three years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Admission to bail; expiration and extension of recognizance, notice to bail bondsman.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102822D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192120(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback