VA HB2443 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Hunting deer with bow and arrow or crossbow on Sundays. Allows persons to hunt deer with a bow and arrow or crossbow on private lands in the Northern Virginia Planning District on Sundays.
Title
Hunting deer; allows persons to hunt with a bow and arrow or crossbow on Sundays.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-25 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: #2 Natural Resources | |
2011-01-19 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-19 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11103978D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2443 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2443+hil |