VA HB2439 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

DNA analysis; conviction of certain crimes or similar ordinance of a locality. Adds persons convicted of a violation of a local ordinance that is similar to certain crimes listed under current law to the list of persons from whom a blood, saliva, or tissue sample shall be taken for DNA analysis to determine identification characteristics specific to the person. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DNA analysis; conviction of certain crimes or similar ordinance of a locality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 201 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President
2019-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2439ER)
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106544D-S1 (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2439S1
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106544D-S1
2019-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106544D-S1
2019-02-06SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103201D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192310.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2439
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2439+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2439S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2439ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0201+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0025+HB2439
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0020+HB2439
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1876+HB2439
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0219+HB2439
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB2439+HB2439
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB2439+HB2439
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2795+HB2439

Bill Comments

feedback