VA HB2438 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
General Assembly Conflicts of Interests Act; contracts by legislators. Clarifies that a legislator may have a personal interest in a contract with an executive or judicial branch agency or a local government agency when the Virginia Public Procurement Act allows the award of such contract without competition.
Title
General Assembly Conflicts of Interests Act; contracts by legislators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | Incorporated by Courts of Justice |
2017-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1854-Gilbert) by voice vote |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Ethics |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17104162D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2438 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2438+hil |