VA HB2437 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; use of best value contracting; construction and professional services. Authorizes any public body to procure construction on a best value procurement basis. Under the bill, if proceeding on a best value procurement basis, the Request for Proposal must contain a notice to potential offerors that the procurement decision will be made on a best value procurement basis and describe (i) the criteria that will be considered in evaluating the proposals and (ii) the rating or weighting system that will be used in evaluating the proposals, including a disclosure that price will be weighted at least 51 percent as a factor.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; use of best value contracting.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in General Laws |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17102962D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 5102.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 6314.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4345 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 223 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2437 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2437+hil |