VA HB2434 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; community schools. Requires the Department of Education to establish an interagency taskforce composed of state and local agencies and entities in the areas of early childhood development, health, social services, community engagement, family engagement, higher education, and workforce development for the purpose of developing a pilot program for the establishment of community schools whereby public elementary and secondary schools serve as centers for the provision of such community programs and services to students and their families as may be necessary based on the unique needs of the student population to be served. The bill requires such pilot program to include a process by which school boards and community partnerships may apply to the Department of Education to designate an elementary or secondary school in the local school division as a community school. The bill also establishes a special nonreverting fund in the state treasury for the purpose of providing planning grants for school boards who seek to apply to the Department of Education through such pilot program for community school designation.
Title
Community schools; Department of Education to establish taskforce for pilot program.
Sponsors
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Education |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103900D |