VA HB2431 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0239)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0239)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School property; retail fee-based electric vehicle charging stations. Permits any school board to locate and operate retail fee-based electric vehicle charging stations on school property, provided that the use of each such station during the school day is restricted to school board employees, students, and authorized visitors and each such station is accompanied by appropriate signage that provides reasonable notice of such restriction.
Title
School property; retail fee-based electric vehicle charging stations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0239) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 239 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2431ER) |
2017-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17104195D |