VA HB2429 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Preliminary protective orders; hearing dates. Allows the full hearing resulting from the issuance of a preliminary protective order to be heard on the same hearing or trial date as a related criminal offense if such hearing or trial date has already been set for a date later than 15 days after the issuance of the preliminary protective order. Current law requires that a full hearing be held within 15 days of the issuance of a preliminary protective order in every instance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preliminary protective orders; hearing dates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N)
2019-01-17HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103367D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161253.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192152.9(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback