VA HB2428 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Preliminary protective orders; hearing by two-way electronic video and audio communication. Gives discretion to a court to allow a petitioner granted a preliminary protective order to appear by two-way electronic video and audio communication for a full hearing on the protective order if such petitioner is physically incapable of appearing at the hearing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protective orders, preliminary; hearing by two-way electronic video and audio communication.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103285D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161253.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192152.9(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback