VA HB2428 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Preliminary protective orders; hearing by two-way electronic video and audio communication. Gives discretion to a court to allow a petitioner granted a preliminary protective order to appear by two-way electronic video and audio communication for a full hearing on the protective order if such petitioner is physically incapable of appearing at the hearing.
Title
Protective orders, preliminary; hearing by two-way electronic video and audio communication.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Richard Sullivan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103285D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 253.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 152.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |