VA HB2424 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0415)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0415)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Interpreters for persons who are deaf or hard of hearing. Provides that if the Department for the Deaf and Hard-of-Hearing cannot procure a qualified interpreter to assist a party or witness in a civil proceeding who is speech-impaired or who is deaf or hard of hearing, then the court may appoint a readily available interpreter with full certification from the Registry of Interpreters for the Deaf, Inc., or an equivalent national certification.
Title
Interpreters for persons who are deaf or hard of hearing; court may appoint certified interpreter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0415) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 415 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2424ER) |
2023-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23104740D |
2023-01-18 | House | Unanimous consent to introduce |
Same As/Similar To
SB814 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)
SB814 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)
SB814 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 164.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 384.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |