VA HB2424 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Local law-enforcement agencies; body-worn camera systems. Requires localities to adopt and establish a written policy for the operation of a body-worn camera system, as defined in the bill, that conforms to the model policy established by the Department of Criminal Justice Services (the Department) prior to purchasing or deploying a body-worn camera system. The bill requires the Department to establish a model policy for the operation of body-worn camera systems and the storage and maintenance of body-worn camera system records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law-enforcement agencies, local; body-worn camera systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 3-N) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 3-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100257D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521723.1(n/a)See Bill Text
91102(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback