VA HB2423 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0088)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Flashing red and white warning lights; emergency vehicle exemptions; WMATA Response and Recovery Coordination Branch vehicles. Authorizes vehicles operated by the Response and Recovery Coordination Branch of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority's Office of Emergency Preparedness to (i) be equipped with flashing, blinking, or alternating red or red and white combination warning lights and (ii) disregard certain regulations regarding the operation of vehicles without being subject to criminal prosecution while responding to an emergency, provided that the operator of such vehicle has received certain training and recertifies every two years. The bill adds responding to metropolitan transit-related incidents to the list of circumstances in which such lighted warning lights shall be displayed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Flashing red and white warning lights; emergency vehicle exemptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0088)
2023-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 88 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2423ER)
2023-02-24HouseEnrolled
2023-02-21SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-21SenateRead third time
2023-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-16SenateReported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
2023-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2023-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-02-06HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2023-02-06HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2023-02-03HousePrinted as engrossed 23104732D-E
2023-02-03HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2423E
2023-02-03HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2023-02-03HouseRead second time
2023-02-02HouseRead first time
2023-01-31HouseReported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
2023-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
2023-01-20HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 Highway Safety and Policy
2023-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2023-01-18HousePresented and ordered printed 23104732D

Same As/Similar To

SB981 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)
SB981 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621023(n/a)See Bill Text
4621030(n/a)See Bill Text
462920(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+HB2423
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2423+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2423E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2423ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0088+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23105476A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+amd+HB2423AH
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB2423F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB2423FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB2423FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H1903V0008+HB2423
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H19V0057+HB2423
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1436+HB2423
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S11V0078+HB2423
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0630HB2423+HB2423
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0679HB2423+HB2423

Bill Comments

feedback