VA HB2417 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice with letter (12-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice with letter (12-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency protective order; required conditions; petition to dissolve or modify. Requires any emergency protective order to prohibit (i) the respondent from committing acts of family abuse or criminal offenses that result in injury to person or property and (ii) such contacts by the respondent with the allegedly abused person or family or household members of the allegedly abused person, including prohibiting the respondent from being in the physical presence of the allegedly abused person or family or household members of the allegedly abused person, as the judge or magistrate deems necessary to protect the safety of such persons. Under current law, a judge or magistrate must only impose one or more of such prohibitions when issuing an emergency protective order. Other conditions that may be imposed under current law remain under the discretion of the judge or magistrate. The bill also allows the petitioner of an emergency protective order to file a motion with the court requesting a hearing to dissolve or modify the order.
Title
Emergency protective order; required conditions, petition to dissolve or modify.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice with letter (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice with letter (12-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102967D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 253.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 152.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |