VA HB2415 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0655)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0655)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
American Revolution 250 Commission; report. Changes the American Revolution 250 Commission, established in 2020, from an executive branch advisory commission to a legislative branch commission. The bill provides that members previously appointed to the Commission shall continue to serve pursuant to their original appointments. The bill also creates the Virginia American Revolution 250 Commission Fund. The bill extends the Commission's sunset date from July 1, 2027, to July 1, 2032.
Title
American Revolution 250 Commission; changes Commission to a legislative branch commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0655) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 655 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2415ER) |
2023-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2415H1 |
2023-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23105297D-H1 |
2023-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105297D-H1 |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23103580D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1412 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656)
SB1412 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656)
SB1412 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656)
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
General Assembly
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
General Assembly
Study Commissions Committees and Reports