VA HB2414 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax exemption; disabled veterans. Allows a disabled veteran or surviving spouse to apply for a real property tax exemption and receive a decision prior to purchasing a qualifying property. The bill provides that the commissioner of the revenue of the county, city, or town, or such other officer as may be designated by the governing body in which the property is located, shall, within 20 business days of receiving the application, process the application and send a letter to the disabled veteran or surviving spouse stating whether the application is approved or denied. If the application is approved, the bill requires the letter to include the amount of the tax exemption approved. The bill provides, however, that the exemption described in such letter shall become effective only after the disabled veteran or surviving spouse becomes the owner of the property. Real property tax exemption; disabled veterans. Allows a disabled veteran or surviving spouse to apply for a real property tax exemption and receive a decision prior to purchasing a qualifying property. The bill provides that the commissioner of the revenue of the county, city, or town, or such other officer as may be designated by the governing body in which the property is located, shall, within 20 business days of receiving the application, process the application and send a letter to the disabled veteran or surviving spouse stating whether the application is approved or denied. If the application is approved, the bill requires the letter to include the amount of the tax exemption approved. The bill provides, however, that the exemption described in such letter shall become effective only after the disabled veteran or surviving spouse becomes the owner of the property.
Title
Real property; tax exemption for disabled veterans or surviving spouse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 659 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2414ER) |
2023-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 23104140D-E |
2023-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2414E |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2023-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-01 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2023-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2023-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23104140D |