VA HB2411 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0348)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Timber sales; theft; accounting; penalty. Provides that a person who buys and removes timber from a landowner's property is guilty of timber theft if he fails to pay the landowner by the date specified in their agreement or, if there is no written agreement, within 60 days of removing the timber. The bill provides that a person who is convicted of timber theft is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor and shall be ordered to pay three times the value of the timber removed in addition to any penalties imposed by the court. The bill provides that, following the passing of the payment deadline, a buyer's failure to pay within 10 days of receiving a demand for payment shall constitute prima facie evidence of the buyer's intent to violate the timber theft provision. An exception exists for a purchaser who made payment to a person he believed in good faith to be the rightful owner of the timber.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Timber theft; theft, accounting, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0348)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 348 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2411ER)
2019-02-23HouseEnrolled
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19107005D-S1 (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2411S1
2019-02-20SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19107005D-S1
2019-02-20SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-14SenateCommittee substitute printed 19107005D-S1
2019-02-14SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HousePrinted as engrossed 19104121D-E
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2411E
2019-02-01HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104121D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011105(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2411
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2411+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2411E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2411S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2411ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0348+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0102V0010+HB2411
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0035+HB2411
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2165+HB2411
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2239+HB2411
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S01V0084+HB2411
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0378+HB2411
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2411+HB2411
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0893HB2411+HB2411
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3218+HB2411

Bill Comments

feedback