VA HB2406 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Family life education curricula; personal privacy and personal boundaries. Requires any family life education curriculum offered in any elementary school, middle school, or high school to include instruction on the importance of the personal privacy and personal boundaries of other individuals and tools for a student to use to ensure that he respects the personal privacy and personal boundaries of other individuals.
Title
Family life education curricula; instruction shall include personal privacy and personal boundaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (60-Y 31-N) (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Education |
2017-02-06 | House | Rereferred to Education |
2017-02-06 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (60-Y 31-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (60-Y 31-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-02 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | House | Reported from Education (18-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2017-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17104044D |