VA HB2404 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Advisory Council on Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders Associated with Streptococcal Infections (PANDAS) and Pediatric Acute-onset Neuropsychiatric Syndrome (PANS). Creates the Advisory Council on Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders Associated with Streptococcal Infections and Pediatric Acute-onset Neuropsychiatric Syndrome to advise the Commissioner of Health on research, diagnosis, treatment, and education relating to these identified disorders and syndrome referred to by the National Institute of Mental Health as PANDAS and PANS. The bill provides for a three-year sunset for the Advisory Council.
Title
PANDAS and PANS; created, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 4-N) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 466 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2404ER) |
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (93-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (93-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 17103774D-E |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2404E |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendments (18-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103774D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 73.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 73.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 73.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |