VA HB2403 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Impacts to wetlands; permit requirements for compensation. Requires the State Water Control Board to evaluate Virginia Water Protection Permits mitigation options for impacts to wetlands on a case-by-case basis with consideration for which option is practicable and ecologically and environmentally preferable, including, in terms of replacement of acreage and functions, which option has the greatest likelihood of success and avoidance of temporal loss of acreage and function.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wetlands; impact, permit requirements for compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 545 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2403ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19SenateRead third time
2019-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HousePrinted as engrossed 19102108D-E
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2403E
2019-02-01HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102108D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62144.15:21(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2403
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2403+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2403E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2403ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0545+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0103V0013+HB2403
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0043+HB2403
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2163+HB2403
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2237+HB2403
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S01V0087+HB2403
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0772HB2403+HB2403
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0822HB2403+HB2403

Bill Comments

feedback