VA HB2403 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles bearing clean special fuel license plates; Vehicles bearing clean special fuel license plates; use of high occupancy toll lanes. Exempts vehicles bearing clean special fuel license plates that were obtained from the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) before July 1, 2011, from any high occupancy toll lane designation of Interstate 66, and exempts vehicles bearing clean special fuel license plates that were obtained from the DMV before July 1, 2006, from any high occupancy toll lane designation of Interstates 95 and 395 inside the Capital Beltway until January 1, 2020.
Title
Vehicles bearing clean special fuel license plates; use of high-occupancy toll (HOT) lanes.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Greason [R] | Del. Richard Anderson [R] | Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Timothy Hugo [R] |
Del. Robert Marshall [R] | Del. Michael Webert [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Transportation |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103694D |
Subjects
High-occupancy Toll (HOT) Lanes
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Interstate Route 395
Interstate Route 66
Interstate Route 95
License Plates and Registration
Motor Vehicles
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Interstate Route 395
Interstate Route 66
Interstate Route 95
License Plates and Registration
Motor Vehicles
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2403 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2403+hil |